on June 12, 2021.
and her husband, Adam, welcomed a daughter, Sloane Penelope Galvan, on Jan. 8, 2022.
started as a subcontract administrator in the aerospace and defense industry with United Launch Alliance.
Lindley Hanley ’02
received her fifth National Achiever Award in Wealth Management at JPMorgan Chase for being in the top 5% of producers in private banking across the company.
Erin Rutledge ’12
and James Clark, December 11, 2021.
John Allison ’02
has been named the new football coach at Sacred Heart-Griffin in Springfield.
Brad Cushman ’84
retired in April after overseeing the art department and gallery at University of Arkansas, Little Rock.
James Alexander ’69
completed 11 half marathon races in 11 days, from June 1-11, in 11 states. Each half marathon was 13.1 miles and he ran 144.1 miles in total during that time. Next, Jim plans on doing a race in all lower 48 states and so far has raced in 38 states.
Megan Bettis ’10
and Jared Kirkhart, October 9, 2021.
Kourtney Pollitt ’22
has accepted a position as a communication specialist for the Illinois Senate Democratic Caucus.
Nely Munoz ’20
started a new position as associate functional consultant at Sikich.
Braedon Sheppard ’17
started a new position as associate video producer at Riot Games.
Heath Bruce ’17
started a new position as assistant director of marketing at University of Illinois Springfield.
Austin Dearing ’16
started a new position as vehicle dynamics engineer at Rivian.
Kayla Graven ’11
is celebrating four years at Downtown Springfield, Inc.
Jim Spizzo ’74
is honored to report that his photo, “Superstition Saloon Tableau,” has been selected by the jury for inclusion in the upcoming Americana Photography Exhibition, sponsored by the Midwest Center for Photography in Wichita, Kansas. He shot the photo in Tortilla Flat, Arizona.
Frank Bridgewater ’72
retired as vice president and editor of the Honolulu Star-Advertiser. He was editor of the Honolulu Star-Bulletin until 2010, when it acquired the larger Honolulu Advertiser and the papers were merged. Before Honolulu, he received a master’s degree from the University of Missouri School of Journalism and worked in New York at The Wall Street Journal as night news editor and then The New York Times as assistant financial editor.
Taylor Thomas ’14
graduated from Pittsburg State University in May with a master’s degree in human resource development.
Daniel Hackett ’10
has been promoted to district director for community and specialty pharmacy at AmerisourceBergen.
Megan Bettis Kirkhart ’10
started a new position as a career development coordinator at University of Wisconsin-Oshkosh in January.
Teresa Wallbaum ’88
has been appointed as an administrative law judge for the Drug Enforcement Administration in Arlington, Virginia.
Samantha Bentley Renaud ’04
has accepted a position as an ag loan administrator with Green Belt Bank & Trust in Iowa Falls, Iowa.
Vance Martin ’96
is currently the master of Mahomet Masonic Lodge in Mahomet. Each year the organization awards scholarships to local students and the master usually has the privilege of handing them out. This year’s recipient at Mahomet Seymour High School was Haylie Orton, who plans to attend IC in the fall. Vance felt honored as an alumnus to be part of helping a future IC student start on her own pathway.